Global patent index - EP 1010484 A2

EP 1010484 A2 2000-06-21 - Combination conduction/convection furnace

Title (en)

Combination conduction/convection furnace

Title (de)

Kombination eines Konvektions- und eines Konduktionsofens

Title (fr)

Combinaison d'un four à conduction et d'un four à convection

Publication

EP 1010484 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99105668 A

Priority

US 11240098 P

Abstract (en)

A single furnace system (10) integrates, in combination, two or more distinct heating environments (which in the preferred embodiments include a conduction heating environment (23) and a convection heating environment (24)) integrated such that the multiple environments define a continuous heating chamber (14) through which a moving workpiece (such as a casting) transitions from one heating environment to the other without being exposed to the atmosphere. In accordance with the preferred methods, the transitioning of the casting from one environment to the other is accomplished with no meaningful change in temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 29/00; B22D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 5/00 (2006.01); B22D 29/00 (2006.01); B22D 31/00 (2006.01); F27B 9/00 (2006.01); F27B 9/10 (2006.01); F27B 9/30 (2006.01); F27B 15/00 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01); F27D 3/04 (2006.01); F27B 9/24 (2006.01); F27D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 3/00 (2013.01); B22D 29/003 (2013.01); B22D 31/002 (2013.01); F27B 9/00 (2013.01); F27B 9/10 (2013.01); F27B 15/00 (2013.01); F27D 3/04 (2013.01); F27B 9/2415 (2013.01); F27D 2007/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010484 A2 20000621; EP 1010484 A3 20000628; JP 2000202571 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20031017

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI