Global patent index - EP 1010502 A2

EP 1010502 A2 2000-06-21 - Safety device, in particular for cutting machines

Title (en)

Safety device, in particular for cutting machines

Title (de)

Sicherungsvorrichtung, insbesondere für Schneidmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité, en particulier pour machines de coupe

Publication

EP 1010502 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123540 A

Priority

DE 29822200 U

Abstract (en)

The device consists of a cover which is mounted over a cutting blade and a safety lock. The safety lock consists of a rotatably located angle lever (6) which exerts a force on a switch (8) on opening the cover whereby the switch activates the on/off switch of the machine. The cover is secured in place by a spindle (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Sicherungsvorrichtung gegen das Eingreifen in rotierende oder bewegte Teile bei Prokuktionsmaschinen, insbesondere Schneidmaschinen, in der Lebensmittelindustrie, bestehend aus einer das Schneidmesser abdeckenden Haube und einer Sicherheitsverriegelung, wobei die Sicherheitsverriegelung aus einem drehbar gelagerten Winkelhebel besteht, der bei Öffnen des Verschlusses für die Haube zwangsweise eine Bewegung ausführt und mit einer Schaltfahne zum Betätigen eines Ein- und Ausschalters der Maschine versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/22 (2006.01); B26D 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/225 (2013.01); B26D 7/22 (2013.01); B26D 7/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822200 U1 20000413; EP 1010502 A2 20000621; EP 1010502 A3 20020911

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 26D 7/22 A, 7B 26D 7/24 B, 7F 16P 3/08 B

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI