Global patent index - EP 1010503 A2

EP 1010503 A2 2000-06-21 - Cutting device including a first and a second row of cutting blades which can be relatively moved along parallel directions

Title (en)

Cutting device including a first and a second row of cutting blades which can be relatively moved along parallel directions

Title (de)

Schneidvorrichtung mit einer ersten und einer zweiten Messerreihe, die parallel zueinander verschiebbar sind

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe ayant un premier et un deuxième alignement d'outils pouvant se déplacer l'un vis-à-vis de l'autre le long de directions parallèles

Publication

EP 1010503 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124524 A

Priority

DE 19858572 A

Abstract (en)

The cutting system is provided with a second row of cutting blades (15), in which the second blades are arranged at a distance to each other, and which are movable parallel to the first row (14). The cutting blades (14) of the first row and the blades (15) of the second row lie respectively against each other.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Schneidvorrichtung (1) für eine Warenbahn (2), insbesondere aus Papier oder Karton angegeben, mit einer Messerreihe (4), die sich über die Breite der Warenbahn (2) erstreckt und mehrere Messer aufweist, die mit Abstand zueinander in einer Reihe nebeneinander angeordnet sind. Hierbei möchte man die Schwächung und die Festigkeit der Warenbahn (2) besser aufeinander abstimmen können. Hierzu ist eine zweite Reihe von Messern (15) vorgesehen, in der zweite Messer mit Abstand zueinander angeordnet sind und die parallel zur ersten Reihe (14) verschiebbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010503 A2 20000621; EP 1010503 A3 20030423; EP 1010503 B1 20050330; DE 19858572 C1 20001005

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050330

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2006-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-10-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911840

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040427

2004-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI