Global Patent Index - EP 1010517 A1

EP 1010517 A1 2000-06-21 - Apparatus for stacking and transferring plastic bags with wicket holes

Title (en)

Apparatus for stacking and transferring plastic bags with wicket holes

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Sammeln und Abtransportieren von mit Stapelöffnungen versehenen Kunststoffbeuteln

Title (fr)

Appareil pour empiler et transférer des sachets en plastique avec des trous de cheville

Publication

EP 1010517 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120739 A

Priority

DE 19858559 A

Abstract (en)

A rotating bag transfer wheel(4) with radial vanes rotates around one axis(7) and a collecting unit(13) with stacking bars(17) carrying pairs of pins(18) for gathering bags by the preformed openings rotates around another axis(23). The axes of the transfer wheel and collecting unit are transverse to each other.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Vorrichtung zum Sammeln und gegebenenfalls Verblocken von mit Stapelöffnungen versehenen Kunststoffbeuteln (1) mit einer Flügelrad-Übergabevorrichtung (4) sowie einer nachgeschalteten Sammeleinrichtung (13), wobei eine sichere Übergabe der Kunststoffbeutel (1) auf engstem Raum dadurch erreicht wird, dass die Umlauf- bzw. Drehachse (7, 23) der Flügelrad-Übergabevorrichtung (4) und der Sammeleinrichtung (13) im wesentlichen quer zueinander angeordnet sind und auf diese Weise relativ nah beieinander angeordnet werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 19/98

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/98 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 70/00 (2017.08); B31B 2160/10 (2017.08); B31B 70/984 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010517 A1 20000621; EP 1010517 B1 20030611; DE 19858559 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEMO MASCHINENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041020

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEMO MASCHINENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031010

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031009

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031009

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905920 P 20030717

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI