Global Patent Index - EP 1010525 A1

EP 1010525 A1 2000-06-21 - Sheet guiding device for a printing machine

Title (en)

Sheet guiding device for a printing machine

Title (de)

Bogenführungseinrichtung für eine Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage de feuilles pour une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 1010525 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123746 A

Priority

DE 19857745 A

Abstract (en)

Nozzles (20) are provided in the conducting surface (11) of the paper web. The nozzles can introduced an air blast or an air suction to the paper web. The size of the passage cross section of at least individual nozzles (20) is adjustable. The nozzles (20) are formed by openings (13,19, fig.4) in one of the guide vanes (11) of the wall (12). A valve element (17) is arranged on the side of the wall (12), facing away from the guide surface (11), which is movable in one or more extension directions of the wall relative to this. So that in one setting of the valve element, openings (13,19) in the wall (12) and in the valve (17), at least partly overlap each other.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Bogenführungseinrichtung für eine Druckmaschine mit einer sich längs der Bogenbahn erstreckenden Leitfläche (11) und mit in der Leitfläche (11) vorgesehenen Düsen (20), die mit Blasluft oder Saugluft beaufschlagbar sind, sind die Düsen (20) durch Öffnungen (13. 19) in einer die Leitfläche (11) bildenden Wand (12) und in einem auf der der Leitfläche (11) abgekehrten Seite der Wand (12) angeordneten Ventilelement (17) gebildet, das in einer oder mehreren Erstreckungsrichtungen der Wand (12) relativ zu dieser bewegbar ist, wobei in einer Stellung des Ventilelements die Öffnungen (13, 19) in der Wand (12) und im Ventilelement (17) einander vollständig überschneiden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/00; B65H 29/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/52 (2013.01); B41F 21/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010525 A1 20000621; EP 1010525 B1 20040102; AT 257083 T 20040115; DE 19857745 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2004-01-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040102

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020813

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI