Global Patent Index - EP 1010529 A3

EP 1010529 A3 2000-07-19 - Cylinder for a rotary press

Title (en)

Cylinder for a rotary press

Title (de)

Walze für eine Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Cylindre pour une presse rotative

Publication

EP 1010529 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104748 A

Priority

  • DE 19653404 A
  • EP 97952747 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19653404A1] The invention relates to a rotary press which, in a first operating mode, is divided into many sections. In a second operating mode, this cylinder has a functionally continuous surface area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/26; B41F 31/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/24 (2006.01); B41F 31/15 (2006.01); B41F 31/18 (2006.01); B41F 31/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/15 (2013.01); B41F 31/18 (2013.01); B41F 31/26 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49547 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49549 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29623425 U1 19980520; BR 9713609 A 20000411; BR 9714158 A 20000425; CN 1084256 C 20020508; CN 1093470 C 20021030; CN 1245458 A 20000223; CN 1254311 A 20000524; DE 19653404 A1 19980702; DE 29623426 U1 19980528; DE 59701739 D1 20000621; DE 59703698 D1 20010705; DE 59706145 D1 20020228; EP 0946369 A1 19991006; EP 0946369 B1 20010530; EP 0946370 A1 19991006; EP 0946370 B1 20000517; EP 1010529 A2 20000621; EP 1010529 A3 20000719; EP 1010529 B1 20020109; ES 2147464 T3 20000901; ES 2158612 T3 20010901; HK 1026399 A1 20020830; JP 2000506801 A 20000606; JP 2000516169 A 20001205; JP 3157170 B2 20010416; JP 3187062 B2 20010711; RU 2198793 C2 20030220; US 6129017 A 20001010; US 6398701 B1 20020604; WO 9828141 A1 19980702; WO 9828142 A1 19980702

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071219

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020406

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706145 20020228

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 946369

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOHRMANN, HANS DIERK

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 946369

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI