Global Patent Index - EP 1010598 A1

EP 1010598 A1 2000-06-21 - Movable door sill module, especially for reducing a gap between a vehicle door and a platform and arrangement of this module in a railway vehicle

Title (en)

Movable door sill module, especially for reducing a gap between a vehicle door and a platform and arrangement of this module in a railway vehicle

Title (de)

Bewegliches Schwellenmodul, insbesondere um eine Lücke zwischen einer Fahrzeugtür und einem Bahnsteig zu verringern, und Anordnung von diesem Modul in einem Schienenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Module de seuil mobile, notamment pour réduire une lacune entre une porte de véhicule et un quai, et agencement de ce module dans un véhicule ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1010598 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402440 A

Priority

FR 9815539 A

Abstract (en)

The mobile vehicle sill consists of a base (23), designed to be fixed to the floor of the vehicle, and carrying a longitudinal mobile sill (22). The means for the displacement of the sill are also fitted to the base and consist of an adjustable length jack (56), which extends longitudinally, roughly parallel to the sill, and which is connected to the base and the sill by hinge assemblies (28A, 28B), which transform the movement of the jack into movement and displacement of the sill.

Abstract (fr)

Ce module de seuil mobile comprend une embase (23), destinée à être fixée sur un plancher du véhicule, portant un seuil mobile longitudinal (22) et des moyens (26) de déplacement de ce seuil mobile (22). Les moyens de déplacement (26) comportent un vérin (56) de longueur réglable, s'étendant longitudinalement sensiblement parallèlement au seuil mobile (22), relié à l'embase (23) et au seuil mobile (22) par au moins un ensemble articulé (28A, 28B) transformant les variations de longueur du vérin (56) en déplacements en translation du seuil mobile (22). De préférence, l'ensemble articulé forme un polygone, par exemple un hexagone. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 23/025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010598 A1 20000621; EP 1010598 B1 20040107; AT 257444 T 20040115; DE 69914056 D1 20040212; DE 69914056 T2 20040708; DK 1010598 T3 20040517; ES 2213340 T3 20040816; FR 2787080 A1 20000616; FR 2787080 B1 20010119; PT 1010598 E 20040531

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 257444

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140919

2014-10-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140926

2014-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A., CH

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69914056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140210

2014-03-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69914056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECH, DE

- Effective date: 20140210

2014-03-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69914056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND , DE

- Effective date: 20140210

2014-02-28 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20140217

2014-02-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140123 AND 20140129

2014-02-17 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-02-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69914056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER, DE

2013-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2013-12-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2013-11-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20131018

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101005

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110501

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110405

2011-05-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110501

2010-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091005

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091005

2010-07-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2010-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2213340

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040400192

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69914056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2004-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001021

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI