Global Patent Index - EP 1010621 A1

EP 1010621 A1 2000-06-21 - Device for feeding groups of cigarettes

Title (en)

Device for feeding groups of cigarettes

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zuführen von Zigarettengruppen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour alimenter des groupes de cigarettes

Publication

EP 1010621 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123545 A

Priority

DE 19857600 A

Abstract (en)

The groups of cigarettes (10) are pushed by push bars (14) from shafts (13) of a magazine (12). The push bars always move above a support board (19) for the cigarettes (11) during the ejection movement and the return movement. During cigarette ejection, the bars move at a distance above the board. During the return movement, the bars are moved downwards so that the down movement of the cigarettes in the shafts is initiated before the bars return to their original position, and is completed when the bars have reached the end of the movement.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Fertigung von Zigarettenpackungen sind Zigarettengruppen (10) aus mehreren in Lagen angeordneten Zigaretten (11) zu bilden, und zwar durch Ausschub der Zigarettengruppe (10) (oder einer Teilgruppe) aus Schächten (13) eines Zigaretten-Magazins (12) mit Hilfe von hin- und herbewegbaren Stößeln (14). Nach dem Ausschub einer Zigarettengruppe (10) fallen die Zigaretten (11) in den Magazinschächten (13) aufgrund Eigengewichts in die Ausschubposition. Durch eine Abwärtsbewegung der Stößel (14) während der Rückbewegung in eine Ausgangsstellung wird die Fallbewegung der Zigaretten (11) bereits eingeleitet, bevor die Stößel (14) die Ausgangsstellung erreicht haben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/04 (2006.01); A24C 5/39 (2006.01); B65B 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4856538 A 19890815 - FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

US 3993217 A 19761123 - DAVIES ROBERT WILLIAM, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010621 A1 20000621; EP 1010621 B1 20040303; BR 9907389 A 20010116; CN 1131814 C 20031224; CN 1257028 A 20000621; DE 19857600 A1 20000621; JP 2000185707 A 20000704; KR 20000048135 A 20000725; US 6397559 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908723

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-04-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908723 P 20040408

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI