Global Patent Index - EP 1010625 A1

EP 1010625 A1 2000-06-21 - Packaging container made of foam material

Title (en)

Packaging container made of foam material

Title (de)

Verpackungsbehälter aus Schaumstoff

Title (fr)

Récipient d' emballage en matériau mousse

Publication

EP 1010625 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123256 A

Priority

EP 98123256 A

Abstract (en)

The container has a base (2) and side walls (3,4,5,6) supported on each other via a releaseable plug connection. This is formed by projections (7,8) facing vertically inwards from base and walls. When in use, a gate or hood-shaped projection on the base engages over a wall projection on the side away from and parallel to, the base. The walls are fastened to the base via hinges and are moved relative to it, thereby connecting the projections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 6/18; B65D 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/22 (2006.01); B65D 6/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/225 (2013.01); B65D 11/1833 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010625 A1 20000621; EP 1010625 B1 20010131; AT 199004 T 20010215; DE 59800458 D1 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081207

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071207

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FEBRA-KUNSTSTOFFE G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071207

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071206

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070105

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800458 20010308

2001-03-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR IT

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT

2001-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199004 T 20010215

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990728

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI