Global Patent Index - EP 1010627 A1

EP 1010627 A1 2000-06-21 - Container

Title (en)

Container

Title (de)

Behälter

Title (fr)

Récipient

Publication

EP 1010627 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116999 A

Priority

DE 29816750 U

Abstract (en)

At least one of the plastics ring at each end of the container has an outer flange ring, a profiled ring lying against the body, and an intermediate ring connecting the flange ring and profiled ring and forming a neck. The intermediate ring is connected to the profiled ring by a radius. The profiled ring has a retaining ring fitted in an encircling groove in the body, and a radial section encompassing the transition area from the cylindrical body and bottom or top.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Behälter (1), insbesondere Metall- und Kunststoffaß, mit einem Behälterkorpus (2) aus Metall aus einem annähernd zylindrischen Mantel (14), einem Deckel (6) und einem Boden (5), wobei der Behälterkorpus (2) an jedem Ende mit einem über den Behälterkorpus vorstehenden Kunststoffring (3,4) eingefaßt ist, weist zumindest einer der Kunststoffringe (3,4) einen äußeren Flanschring (8,8'), einen am Korpus anliegenden Formring (9,9') und einen Flanschring (8,8') und Formring (9,9') verbindenden, eine Einschnürung (10,10') bildenden Zwischenring (11,11') auf.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 25/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/20 (2006.01); B65D 8/08 (2006.01); B65D 25/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/24 (2013.01); B65D 7/045 (2013.01); Y10S 206/821 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29816750 U1 19981217; BR 9904208 A 20000801; BR 9904208 B1 20090113; EP 1010627 A1 20000621; JP 2000095247 A 20000404; US 6662963 B1 20031216

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-20 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050303

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020827

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI