Global Patent Index - EP 1010629 A1

EP 1010629 A1 2000-06-21 - Stretchable bag

Title (en)

Stretchable bag

Title (de)

Dehnbarer Beutel

Title (fr)

Sac étirable

Publication

EP 1010629 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98310387 A

Priority

EP 98310387 A

Abstract (en)

A stretchable bag includes an enclosed bag body (1) made of a bag fabric. The bag body (1) has an opening (2) at one place thereof. The bag fabric includes an elastic layer (11) and a surface layer (12) adhered thereto. The elastic layer (11) is preferably formed from foamed polybutylene gum or styrene or butadiene gum. The surface layer (12) being preferably formed a fabric of nylon yarns or polyester yarns. The bag body (1) has an elasticity that enables the opening (2) to be stretched open to facilitate placement of articles into the bag body (1) and to contract thereafter to ensure that the contents of the bag body (1) do not fall out. At least one side of the bag fabric is provided with an ornamental layer (14) to enhance visual effects. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 30/08; B65D 33/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 1/00 (2006.01); A45C 13/08 (2006.01); A45C 13/10 (2006.01); B65D 33/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/16 (2013.01); A45C 1/00 (2013.01); A45C 13/08 (2013.01); A45C 13/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010629 A1 20000621; EP 1010629 B1 20030903; DE 69817838 D1 20031009; DE 69817838 T2 20040708

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071217

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061217

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061217

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69817838 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI