Global Patent Index - EP 1010631 A1

EP 1010631 A1 2000-06-21 - Sachet, method of using same and method of fabricating same

Title (en)

Sachet, method of using same and method of fabricating same

Title (de)

Beutel, Verfahren für die Anwendung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Sachet, procédé de fabrication du sachet, et utilisation du sachet

Publication

EP 1010631 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402921 A

Priority

FR 9815896 A

Abstract (en)

The sachet is triangular in cross section decreasing upwardly from its base (2) to a peak (3). It is obtained by folding flexible sheet and sealing at three edges (7, 8, 9). The first edge extends from base to peak, two others (8, 9) form two of the three sides of the sachet base. An Independent claim is included for the method of packing, using a sheet folded and sealed as indicated, preferably by heat or ultrasound.

Abstract (fr)

La présente demande concerne un sachet (1) pour le conditionnement d'un produit, notamment cosmétique, ledit sachet présentant une section transversale sensiblement triangulaire, décroissante depuis une base (2) jusqu'à un sommet (3), et étant obtenu de pliage d'une feuille souple, scellée selon trois bords (7, 8, 9), un premier bord (7) s'étendant depuis ladite base (2) jusqu'au sommet (3), et deux bords (8, 9) formant deux des trois côtés de ladite base (2) du sachet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 30/28; B65D 75/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/00 (2006.01); B65B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 30/28 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 75/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 31/18 (2013.01); B65D 75/5822 (2013.01); B65D 75/50 (2013.01); Y10S 383/906 (2013.01); Y10S 383/907 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010631 A1 20000621; AR 013550 A1 20001227; BR 9907334 A 20010703; CA 2292786 A1 20000616; CN 1091722 C 20021002; CN 1263850 A 20000823; FR 2787421 A1 20000623; FR 2787421 B1 20010112; JP 2000203596 A 20000725; JP 3513649 B2 20040331; US 2001004087 A1 20010621; US 6267507 B1 20010731; US 6416223 B2 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040127

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020813

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI