Global Patent Index - EP 1010635 A2

EP 1010635 A2 2000-06-21 - Closure cap for a drug vessel with closed shaped container neck

Title (en)

Closure cap for a drug vessel with closed shaped container neck

Title (de)

Verschlusskappe für einen Medikamentenbehälter mit geschlossen ausgebildetem Behälterhals

Title (fr)

Capuchon de fermeture d'un récipient pour médicaments avec un goulot façonné fermé

Publication

EP 1010635 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124158 A

Priority

DE 19858715 A

Abstract (en)

Closure cap is provided with at least one chamber (13, 13') which is formed integrally with its lid section, protrudes from the outer surface (14) of the lid section and holds a sealing element (17, 17'). The sealing surface (16, 16') of the sealing element facing the top surface (15) of the container neck (4) only slightly protrudes beyond the inside surface of the cap lid section.

Abstract (de)

Die einen Deckel- und einen Mantelbereich (2 bzw. 3) aufweisende topfförmige Verschlußkappe (1) für einen Medikamenten-, insbesondere Infusionsbehälter (5), die auf den geschlossen ausgebildeten Behälterhals (4) aufgesetzt und mit diesem fest verbunden ist, weist in ihrem Deckelbereich (2) mindestens eine Durchstichöffnung (9 bzw. 9') mit einer Dichtung (17 bzw. 17') aus einem elastischen Material auf, wobei in dem Deckelbereich (2) der Verschlußkappe (1) mindestens eine die Dichtung (17 bzw. 17') aufnehmende und mit dem Deckelbereich (2) einstückig ausgebildete Kammerung (13 bzw. 13') vorgesehen ist, die gegenüber der Außenseite (14) des Deckelbereiches (2) soweit nach außen vorsteht, daß eine zur Oberseite (15) des Behälterhalses (4) gerichtete Dichtfläche (16 bzw. 16') der in der Kammerung (13 bzw. 13') eingesetzten Dichtung (17 bzw. 17') nur geringfügig über die Innenseite (18) des Deckelbereiches (2) der Verschlußkappe (1) vorsteht und die Kammerung (13 bzw. 13') die darin eingesetzte Dichtung (17 bzw. 17') haltend umfaßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/00; A61J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/14 (2006.01); B65D 51/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/1406 (2013.01); A61J 1/1418 (2015.05); A61J 1/1431 (2015.05); A61J 1/1475 (2013.01); B65D 51/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010635 A2 20000621; EP 1010635 A3 20010502; EP 1010635 B1 20040303; EP 1010635 B2 20071024; DE 19858715 A1 20000629; DE 19858715 B4 20040812; DE 29824812 U1 20020912; DE 59908724 D1 20040408

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-07-18 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-10-24 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2005-01-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: E. BRAUN GMBH

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908724 P 20040408

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI