Global Patent Index - EP 1010640 A3

EP 1010640 A3 2001-05-16 - Bag-in-box container

Title (en)

Bag-in-box container

Title (de)

Behälter des Typs "bag-in-box"

Title (fr)

Récipient bag-in-box

Publication

EP 1010640 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99203912 A

Priority

GB 9828155 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010640A2] A bag-in-box arrangement having a rigid outer box 10 is provided with an inner bag 20 having two openings 50, 80. One opening 80 has means for connecting the arrangement to an apparatus to be supplied with the contents of the bag. The second opening 50 is such that it may be connected to venting means to allow any gas evolved from the contents of the bag 20 to escape. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/06; B65D 51/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010640 A2 20000621; EP 1010640 A3 20010516; GB 9828155 D0 19990217

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030208

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020927

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 77/06 A, 7B 65D 51/16 B

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI