Global patent index - EP 1010644 A1

EP 1010644 A1 2000-06-21 - Fluid substance dispenser

Title (en)

Fluid substance dispenser

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abgabe einer fliessfähigen Substanz

Title (fr)

Dispositif de distribution d'une substance fluide

Publication

EP 1010644 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123879 A

Priority

DE 19857664 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly to dispense a substance which can be poured has a jet system with a base body (GK) and fitted jet units (DK1,DK2) with different outlet openings. The jet assembly is pref. a one-piece injection molded plastics unit with a homogenous material. It has a stepped shape for a number of outlet openings, forming a common closure plug (VS)

Abstract (de)

Für eine Vorrichtung zur Abgabe einer fließfähigen Substanz wird eine Düsenanordnung mit einem Grundkörper und auf diesen aufsteckbaren Düsenkörpern mit unterschiedlichen Austrittsöffnungen vorgeschlagen. Die Düsenanordnung ist vorteilhafterweise als einstückiges, materialhomogenes Kunststoff-Spritzgußteil ausgeführt und enthält vorzugsweise einen für mehrere Austrittsöffnungen in gestufter Bauform ausgelegten gemeinsamen Verschlußstopfen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/76; B05C 17/005; B65D 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00569 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010644 A1 20000621; DE 19857664 A1 20000621

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI