Global Patent Index - EP 1010645 A1

EP 1010645 A1 2000-06-21 - Cargo container for transporting goods with means of transport

Title (en)

Cargo container for transporting goods with means of transport

Title (de)

Frachtbehälter für den Transport von Gütern mit Transportmitteln

Title (fr)

Conteneur de fret utilisé pour le transport de marchandises, avec moyen de transport

Publication

EP 1010645 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100788 A

Priority

EP 98105092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949161A1] A freight container (1) for bulk solids transported esp. by rail has a container floor (5). The container has one or more integral side-to-side strengthened passages (10) providing lifting points for e.g. a fork lift truck (21). The container floor (5) is a trap-door which may be opened to release and discharge the bulk solid contents. An Independent claim is included for a method of using the above to discharge of solids.

Abstract (de)

Um eine einfachere und weniger aufwendige Be- und Entladung von Transportmitteln einerseits und Entleerung eins Frachtbehälters andererseits unter Aufrechterhaltung einer universellen Verwendbarkeit des Frachtbehälters insbesondere hinsichtlich Be- und Entlademöglichkeiten bereitzustellen, wird mit der vorliegenden Erfindung ein Frachtbehälter (1) für den Transport von Gütern mit Transportmitteln, insbesondere für den Transport von Schüttgütern mit Güterzugwagen (24), bereitgestellt, wobei der Frachtbehälter (1) oberhalb seines Bodens (5) wenigstens eine Aufnahme (10) für ein den Frachtbehälter (1) im Entladezustand durchgreifendes Lastaufnahmemittel (15) eines Förderfahrzeugs (21) aufweist und daß zur Entleerung des Frachtbehälters der Boden (5) nach unten abschwenkbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/12; B65F 1/12; B66F 9/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/12 (2006.01); B65D 90/00 (2006.01); B65D 90/14 (2006.01); B65F 1/12 (2006.01); B66F 9/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/0033 (2013.01); B65D 88/12 (2013.01); B65D 90/14 (2013.01); B65F 1/125 (2013.01); B66F 9/19 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949161 A1 19991013; EP 0949161 B1 20020619; AT 219455 T 20020715; DE 59804502 D1 20020725; DK 0949161 T3 20021014; EP 1010645 A1 20000621; EP 1010645 B1 20031217; ES 2178793 T3 20030101

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120320

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810477

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 256617 T

- Effective date: 20120320

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *RAILTRANS

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *RAILTRANS

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050320

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040401

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810477 P 20040129

2003-12-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0949161 P

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR IT

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-06-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 949161

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT