Global Patent Index - EP 1010652 A1

EP 1010652 A1 2000-06-21 - Receipt printing, storage and discharging mechanism

Title (en)

Receipt printing, storage and discharging mechanism

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Drucken, Lagern und Ausgeben von Gutscheinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour imprimer, accumuler et décharger des reçus

Publication

EP 1010652 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98403157 A

Priority

EP 98403157 A

Abstract (en)

The device (10) allows for the storage of various media, such as receipts, slips, forms, labels, tickets, tags, etc. The receipts are introduced into the device by an adjacently disposed printer (9). The web (8) of the receipt enters the storage and presenting device and is stored within a rib-cage mandrel in an overflow bucket (11). The device (10) is able to store various lengths of the media up to about twenty feet. The device (10) is then caused to rotate through an angle transverse of the printer discharge direction, which angle is preferably ninety degrees. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 15/00; B65H 29/00; B65H 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 15/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 15/00 (2013.01); B65H 29/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010652 A1 20000621; EP 1010652 B1 20030910; DE 69818072 D1 20031016; DE 69818072 T2 20040708

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-08-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69818072 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-09-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020807

2001-04-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI