Global Patent Index - EP 1010656 A3

EP 1010656 A3 2001-05-02 - Device for collating and transferring paper sheets or the like

Title (en)

Device for collating and transferring paper sheets or the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Sammeln und Übergeben von Papierzuschnitten oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour regrouper et transférer des feuilles de papier ou similaires

Publication

EP 1010656 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123481 A

Priority

DE 29822224 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010656A2] Pieces of paper are gathered in a collection cassette and then transferred to a conveyor using a rotating drum and grab. A conveyor feeds the pieces of paper to a sorting device which gathers up the pieces and transfers them to a second conveyor (9) for removal. A collection cassette (1) at the beginning of the sorting device is used to gather up the pieces of paper and below this there is a rotatably driven transfer drum (6). A grab (5) associated with the drum is used to collect a given number of pieces of paper at a time, rotate them though an angle and deposit them on the removal conveyor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/30; B65H 3/32; B65H 5/12; B65H 31/02; B65H 39/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/32 (2006.01); B65H 5/12 (2006.01); B65H 39/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 83/02 (2013.01); B65H 3/32 (2013.01); B65H 5/12 (2013.01); B65H 39/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822224 U1 19990204; EP 1010656 A2 20000621; EP 1010656 A3 20010502; US 6267367 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 31/30 A, 7B 65H 39/10 B, 7B 65H 31/02 B, 7B 65H 5/12 B, 7B 65H 3/32 B

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI