Global Patent Index - EP 1010768 A1

EP 1010768 A1 2000-06-21 - Grey-colored gold alloy, without nickel

Title (en)

Grey-colored gold alloy, without nickel

Title (de)

Graue Goldlegierung, ohne Nickel

Title (fr)

Alliage d'or gris sans nickel

Publication

EP 1010768 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98811224 A

Priority

EP 98811224 A

Abstract (en)

White gold alloy without nickel comprises (in wt.%): 75-76 Au, 5-14 Pd, 7-17 Cu, the Cu amount being inversely proportional to the Pd amount, at least one of Ir, In, Ag, Zn, Ga, Re, Zr, Nb, Si, Ta, and Ti.

Abstract (fr)

Cet alliage d'or blanc sans nickel comprend, exprimé en poids, en plus de 75-76% Au et entre 5 et 14% Pd, entre 7 et 17% de Cu, la proportion de Cu étant sensiblement inversément proportionnelle à celle du Pd, le reste étant formé par au moins un des éléments Ir, In, Ag, Zn, Ga, Re, Zr, Nb, Si, Ta, Ti.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 27/00 (2006.01); C22C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 5/02 (2013.01); A44C 27/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] CH 684616 A
  • [A] GB 2091294 A 19820728 - CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD
  • [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 97, no. 007 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 533 (C - 1259) 11 January 1994 (1994-01-11)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 337 (C - 862) 27 August 1991 (1991-08-27)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 337 (C - 862) 27 August 1991 (1991-08-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010768 A1 20000621; EP 1010768 B1 20030326; DE 69812652 D1 20030430; DE 69812652 T2 20040429; DE 69823891 D1 20040617; DE 69823891 T2 20050519; EP 1245688 A2 20021002; EP 1245688 A3 20021030; EP 1245688 B1 20040512; ES 2195300 T3 20031201; ES 2220846 T3 20041216; JP 2000178669 A 20000627; US 2002127134 A1 20020912; US 6342182 B1 20020129; US 6787102 B2 20040907

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69812652

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: METALOR TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL S.A., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METALOR TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL S.A., CH

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-12-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051214

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69812652 P 20030430

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METALOR TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL S.A.

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI