Global Patent Index - EP 1010785 A3

EP 1010785 A3 2001-03-07 - Cross-lapper

Title (en)

Cross-lapper

Title (de)

Vliesleger

Title (fr)

Etaleur-nappeur

Publication

EP 1010785 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124702 A

Priority

DE 29822461 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010785A2] The assembly to lay the webs from a carding machine, in large laying widths, has a delivery belt, several main trolleys and two continuous conveyor belts over the main trolleys. At least one tensioner trolley (14) has one or more deflection rollers to apply tension to a conveyor belt, with a support trolley (16). The support trolley is a self-standing, mobile trolley, with a drive link to a main trolley (10,11). The tensioner trolley (14) for a conveyor belt and the support trolley (16) are located over the upper main trolley (10). The support trolley (16) has a drive link to the upper main trolley (10) and the tensioner trolley (14) has a drive link to the lower main trolley (11). The web layer (1) has at least one additional tensioner trolley (15) for the other conveyor belt, with its deflection roller moving below the first tensioner trolley (14) and below a belt entry at the upper main trolley (10). The additional tensioner trolley (15) has a drive link to the upper main trolley (10). The tensioner trolleys (14,15) are side by side, with a gap between them, to move in the same direction on a common trolley guide. The web layer (1) has two additional self-standing support trolleys (12,13), each at a lower belt level of the two conveyor belts. The support trolleys (12,13) each have at least three deflection rollers, with their axes on a triangle or a polygon, and generally in an omega-shaped guide for the conveyor belt levels. A support trolley (12) is near the lower main trolley (11), with a drive link to the upper main trolley (10). The other support trolley (13) is integrated with the upper main trolley (10) in a rigid fixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010785 A2 20000621; EP 1010785 A3 20010307; EP 1010785 B1 20031105; DE 29822461 U1 20000518; ES 2210953 T3 20040701

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151211

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151211

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AUTEFA SOLUTIONS GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH, 86316 FRIEDBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59907617

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907617

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907617

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101212

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AUTEFA AUTOMATION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20101231

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2210953 T3

2004-03-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040223

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907617 P 20031211

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010811

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI