Global Patent Index - EP 1010786 A2

EP 1010786 A2 2000-06-21 - Cross-lapper

Title (en)

Cross-lapper

Title (de)

Vliesleger

Title (fr)

Etaleur-nappeur

Publication

EP 1010786 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124703 A

Priority

DE 29822460 U

Abstract (en)

The assembly to lay the webs from a carding machine, in large laying widths, has a delivery belt, several main trolleys and two continuous conveyor belts over the main trolleys. At least one support trolley has at least one roller to support a conveyor belt level. A support trolley (13) is rigidly fitted to the upper main trolley (10). The support trolley (13) is integrated into the upper main trolley (10), at a downwards shoulder of the main trolley (10). The two main trolleys (10,11) are mounted next to each other on a trolley guide. A number of deflection rollers (20-22) are at the support trolleys (12,13) for the conveyor belt levels (26,27). The belt entry (23) and exit (24) are at the same height level. At least three deflections rollers (20-22) are mounted with their axes in a triangle or polygon, to give an omega-shape guide (19) for the conveyor belt levels (26,27). The web layer (1) has at least one self-standing and mobile support trolley (12), near the lower main trolley (11), with a drive link to the upper main trolley (10). The web layer (1) has at least one mobile tensioner trolley for at least one conveyor belt (7,8), with a drive link to at least one of the main trolleys (10,11). The assembly can have at least one additional self-standing support trolley, at one of the belt tensioner trolleys, with a drive link to a main trolley (10).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Vliesleger (1), der besonders für große Legebreiten geeignet ist. Der Vliesleger (1) besitzt ein Abführband (5), mehrere Hauptwagen (10,11) und zwei endlos umlaufende und über die Hauptwagen (10,11) geführte Förderbänder (7,8). Er hat außerdem mindestens einen Stützwagen (12,13,16) mit mindestens einer Rolle zur Stützung eines Förderbandtrums (26,27), wobei der eine Stützwagen (13) starr mit dem oberen Hauptwagen (10) verbunden ist. Der Stützwagen (13) ist in den oberen Hauptwagen (10) integriert und dabei an einem nach unten ragenden Ansatz (25) angeordnet. Der Vliesleger (1) kann auch zwei weitere Stützwagen (12,16) besitzen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010786 A2 20000621; EP 1010786 A3 20010307; EP 1010786 B1 20030924; DE 29822460 U1 20000518; ES 2207107 T3 20040516

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151211

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151211

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AUTEFA SOLUTIONS GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH, 86316 FRIEDBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59907108

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907108

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907108

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101212

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AUTEFA AUTOMATION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20101231

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207107 T3

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907108 P 20031030

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI