Global Patent Index - EP 1010787 A2

EP 1010787 A2 2000-06-21 - Cross-lapper

Title (en)

Cross-lapper

Title (de)

Vliesleger

Title (fr)

Etaleur-nappeur

Publication

EP 1010787 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124713 A

Priority

DE 29822462 U

Abstract (en)

The assembly to lay the webs from a carding machine, in laying widths, has a delivery belt, several main trolleys and two continuous conveyor belts over the main trolleys. At least one support trolley (12,13) supports a conveyor belt level with a number of deflection rollers (20-22) for the conveyor belt levels (26,27). The belt entry (23) and exit (24) are generally at the same height level. At least three deflection rollers (20-22) have their axes on a triangle or a polygon, forming an omega-shaped guide (19) for the lower levels (26,27) of both conveyor belts (7,8) The web layer (1) has two support trolleys (12,13), each at a lower belt level (26,27) of the two conveyor belts (7,8). The web layer (1) has at least one self-standing and mobile support trolley (12), near the lower main trolley (11), with a drive link to the upper main trolley (10). The web layer (1) has a support trolley (13), which is integrated with the upper main trolley (10). The web layer (1) has at least one mobile tensioner trolley for at least one conveyor belt (7,8), with a drive link to at least one of the main trolleys (10,11). The assembly can have at least one additional self-standing support trolley, at one of the belt tensioner trolleys, with a drive link to a main trolley (10,11).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Vliesleger (1), der besonders für große Legebreiten geeignet ist. Der Vliesleger (1) hat ein Abführband (5), mehrere Hauptwagen (10,11) und zwei endlos umlaufende und über die Hauptwagen (10,11) geführte Förderbänder (7,8). Er besitzt ferner mindestens einen Stützwagen (12,13,16) mit mehreren Umlenkrollen (20,21,22) zur Stützung des Förderbandtrums (26,27), wobei der Bandeinlaß (23) und der Bandauslaß (24) im wesentlichen auf gleicher Höhe liegen. Die Umlenkrollen (20,21,22) sind mit ihren Achsen im Dreieck angeordnet und bilden im wesentlichen eine Omega-Führung (19) für das Förderbandtrum (26,27). Der Vliesleger (1) hat zwei Stützwagen (12,13), die jeweils einem unteren Bandtrum (26,27) der beiden Förderbänder (7,8) zugeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010787 A2 20000621; EP 1010787 A3 20010307; EP 1010787 B1 20030924; DE 29822462 U1 20000518; ES 2209319 T3 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151211

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151211

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AUTEFA SOLUTIONS GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59907109

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59907109

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59907109

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101212

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AUTEFA AUTOMATION G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20101231

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209319

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040118

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907109

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI