Global patent index - EP 1010795 A2

EP 1010795 A2 2000-06-21 - Machine for the scouring and bleaching of webs of fabric and the like

Title (en)

Machine for the scouring and bleaching of webs of fabric and the like

Title (de)

Maschine zum Waschen und Bleichen von Textilbahnen und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Machine pour le lavage et le blanchiment des étoffes textiles et analogues

Publication

EP 1010795 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99500238 A

Priority

  • ES 9802583 A
  • ES 9802582 A

Abstract (en)

Into a machine for the treatment of webs of fabric, preferably scouring and bleaching, there is introduced in combination a wringing unit (6) prior to entry into the treatment vat of the machine, for the application of a vacuum to the fabric (2) to be continuously treated, and an arrangement (11,12) for forced passage of the treatment liquid through the web of fabric (2), in a transverse direction to the web of fabric (2) being treated, from an entry face of the web of fabric (2) to the opposed face of the same, which is the liquid outlet face, during the displacement of the web of fabric (2) in the direction of its longitudinal axis, the passage of the liquid being produced by the action of forced suction by means of a liquid suction system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 3/20; D06B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/20 (2006.01); D06B 3/32 (2006.01); D06B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/325 (2013.01); D06B 3/203 (2013.01); D06B 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • DE 3732316 A1 19890413 - ROTTER ERHARD F [DE]
  • ES 432083 A1 19770216 - RIMAR SPA [IT]
  • WO 9719214 A1 19970529 - KUESTERS EDUARD MASCHF [DE], et al
  • DE 3224770 A1 19840105 - ROTTER ERHARD F
  • EP 0615016 A1 19940914 - BENNINGER AG MASCHF [CH]
  • HILDEN J.: "El jigger - un aparato de tintura de gran actualidad", INTERNATIONAL TEXTILE BULLETIN, no. 2, 1996, pages 37,40,42 - 45, XP002947671
  • ZIMMER J.P.: "NUEVAS TECNOLOGIAS EN LA TINTURA DE TEJIDOS", REVISTA DE QUIMICA TEXTIL, no. 137, April 1998 (1998-04-01) - June 1998 (1998-06-01), pages 42,44, - 46,48, XP002947672
  • "New Dyeing", TEXTILE MONTH, February 1989 (1989-02-01), pages 30, XP002947673
  • "Universal-Jigger für Vorbehandlung, Färberei und Spezialbehandlungen", MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, October 1992 (1992-10-01), pages 840, XP002947674
  • "Computer-driven dyejig from UK company", TEXTILE MONTH, August 1984 (1984-08-01), pages 15, XP002947675
  • HILDEN J.: "Jigger - Tintura al ancho con gran flexibilidad", INTERNATIONAL TEXTILE BULLETIN, no. 4, 1995, pages 13,16, XP002947676
  • "Vakuumtechnik spart Zeit und Wasser", MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, no. 1-2, 1996, pages 62, XP002947677
  • HENRIKSEN: "Drive to cut water and energy waste", TEXTILE MONTH, March 1996 (1996-03-01), pages 39, XP002947678
  • HENRIKSEN & HENNINGSEN: "Serious alternative to continuous dyeing", TEXTILE MONTH, February 1998 (1998-02-01), pages 19 - 20, XP002947679
  • BRUGMAN, INFORME TEXTIL, December 1997 (1997-12-01), HOLLAND, pages 1 - 2, XP002947680
  • HENRIKSEN: "Jigger con micro procesador", TECNICA TEXTIL INTERNACIONAL, no. 3, 1987, pages 49, XP002947681
  • Prospectus of the firm BENNINGER, published on September 1995. 'Advanced drive and process control for small lots'
  • BULLIO P.G.: "La Nueva Maquina Modelo "Quicker," de IN.TES, para el Acabado de Tejidos", TEXTILES PANAMERICANOS, vol. 1, 1995, pages 102 - 103, XP002947683
  • KÜSTERS: "Jigger de grandes rollos para articulos especiales", ITS/ITI, April 1982 (1982-04-01), XP002947684
  • "Jiggers", TEXTILE ASIA, January 1992 (1992-01-01), pages 80 - 81, XP002947685
  • "Outsize dyer (Sir James Farmer Norton)", TEXTILE ASIA, July 1980 (1980-07-01), pages 155, XP002947686
  • "Sales boost for Norton", TEXTILE MONTH, September 1987 (1987-09-01), pages 120, XP002947687
  • HENRIKSEN V.: "APPARECCHI JIGGER", NUOVA SELEZIONE TESSILE, April 1993 (1993-04-01), pages 141, XP002947688
  • HENRIKSEN V.: "ITMA FAIR 1991", NUOVA SELEZIONE TESSILE, 1991, pages 138, XP002947689
  • HENRIKSEN: "Vald. Henriksen A/S velebra su 50 aniversario (ITMA-95 Fair in Milan)", ITB TINTORIA/ACABADO/ESTAMPADO, April 1995 (1995-04-01), pages 68, XP002947690

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010795 A2 20000621; EP 1010795 A3 20010613

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030410

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI