Global Patent Index - EP 1010798 A3

EP 1010798 A3 2000-11-08 - Tubular bellows joint for dry-cleaning machines

Title (en)

Tubular bellows joint for dry-cleaning machines

Title (de)

Faltenbagdichtung für Trockenreinigungsmaschinen

Title (fr)

Manchette pour machines à nettoyer à sec

Publication

EP 1010798 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99123154 A

Priority

IT BO980143 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010798A2] A tubular bellows joint (1) for dry-cleaning machines which is made of a material which is resistant to perchloroethylene and is constituted by two tubular segments (2,3) which are connected by at least two elements (4a,4b) which are shaped like a diverging frustum whose inclination is adapted to hinder stagnation of fluff or the like. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 43/00; D06F 37/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/26 (2006.01); D06F 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/266 (2013.01); D06F 43/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010798 A2 20000621; EP 1010798 A3 20001108; IT 244817 Y1 20020314; IT BO980143 U1 20000614

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010718

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI