Global Patent Index - EP 1010799 A3

EP 1010799 A3 2000-12-06 - Non-felting wool and process for applying a non-felting finish

Title (en)

Non-felting wool and process for applying a non-felting finish

Title (de)

Filzfrei ausgerüstete Wolle und Verfahren zur Filzfreiausrüstung

Title (fr)

Laine ne feutrant pas et procédé d'ennoblissement antifeutrant

Publication

EP 1010799 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123974 A

Priority

DE 19858736 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010799A2] Non-felting wool is obtained by (a) exposure to plasma in a corona treatment followed by (b) treatment with an aqueous dispersion of self-dispersing isocyanate. An Independent claim is also included for the process as described above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 10/02; D06M 15/568; D06M 15/564; D06M 10/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 10/02 (2006.01); D06M 10/10 (2006.01); D06M 15/564 (2006.01); D06M 15/568 (2006.01); D06M 101/00 (2006.01); D06M 101/02 (2006.01); D06M 101/10 (2006.01); D06M 101/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/568 (2013.01); D06M 10/025 (2013.01); D06M 10/10 (2013.01); D06M 15/564 (2013.01); D06M 2101/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YD] WO 9530045 A2 19951109 - BASF AG [DE], et al
  • [AD] WO 9741293 A1 19971106 - BAYER AG [DE], et al
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 01 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31)
  • [Y] THORSEN W J: "A CORONA DISCHARGE METHOD OF PRODUCING SHRINK-RESISTANT WOOL AND MOHAIR. PART II: EFFECTS OF TEMPERATURE, CHLORINE GAS, AND MOISTURE", TEXTILE RESEARCH JOURNAL,US,TEXTILE RESEARCH INSTITUTE. PRINCETON, N.J, vol. 38, 1 June 1968 (1968-06-01), pages 644 - 650, XP002039320, ISSN: 0040-5175
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 11 29 November 1996 (1996-11-29)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010799 A2 20000621; EP 1010799 A3 20001206; AU 6535299 A 20000622; AU 767898 B2 20031127; DE 19858736 A1 20000629; JP 2000178869 A 20000627; NZ 501815 A 20010629; TR 9903117 A2 20000721; TR 9903117 A3 20000721; US 6242059 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CHEMICALS AG

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06M 10/02 A, 7D 06M 15/568 B, 7D 06M 15/564 B, 7D 06M 10/10 B, 7D 06M 101:10 Z

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI