Global Patent Index - EP 1010803 A3

EP 1010803 A3 2000-12-13 - Device for detecting the end of service life for synthetic fibre ropes

Title (en)

Device for detecting the end of service life for synthetic fibre ropes

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Ablegereifeerkennung von Kunstfaserseilen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de détection de la fin de la durée d'utilisation pour câbles en fibres synthétiques

Publication

EP 1010803 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123810 A

Priority

  • EP 99123810 A
  • EP 98811203 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010803A2] Aramide fiber cable is built up of concentric strand layers (7,14) with opposite twist directions to give a balanced structure when new. Due to internal wear during use, the structure becomes unbalanced resulting in external twist. An indicator, e.g., an external visual marking (11) on the surface, is used to show the end of useful life when the cable has to be discarded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D07B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/02 (2006.01); D06H 1/00 (2006.01); D07B 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/14 (2013.01); D07B 1/145 (2013.01); D07B 1/148 (2013.01); D07B 1/025 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1016 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1036 (2013.01); D07B 2201/108 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2074 (2013.01); D07B 2205/205 (2013.01); D07B 2401/2015 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

D07B 2205/205 + D07B 2801/10

Citation (search report)

[DA] EP 0731209 A1 19960911 - INVENTIO AG [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010803 A2 20000621; EP 1010803 A3 20001213; EP 1010803 B1 20030521; AR 021579 A1 20020724; AT 241032 T 20030615; AU 6315999 A 20000608; AU 751197 B2 20020808; BR 9907454 A 20001107; BR 9907454 B1 20090113; CA 2291582 A1 20000607; CA 2291582 C 20070410; CN 1108519 C 20030514; CN 1256412 A 20000614; DE 59905634 D1 20030626; DK 1010803 T3 20030901; EG 22017 A 20020630; ES 2200459 T3 20040301; HK 1029607 A1 20031121; IL 133050 A 20031210; IL 133050 D0 20010319; JP 2000170082 A 20000620; JP 4493766 B2 20100630; KR 100629661 B1 20060928; KR 20000047940 A 20000725; NO 313886 B1 20021216; NO 996013 A 20000608; NO 996013 D0 19991207; PT 1010803 E 20031031; TR 9902986 A2 20000721; TR 9902986 A3 20000721; US 6247359 B1 20010619; ZA 9907230 B 20000522

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG, CH

2014-05-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DE REGT GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INVENTIO AG, CH

2014-05-07 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DE REGT GERMANY GMBH

- Effective date: 20140429

2014-05-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DE REGT GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20140324

2014-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DE REGT GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INVENTIO AG, HERGISWIL, CH

- Document: DE 59905634

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DE REGT GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INVENTIO AG, HERGISWIL, NIDWALDEN, CH

- Document: DE 59905634

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-04-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140313 AND 20140319

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101202

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-09-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-09-13 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-08-15 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INVENTIO A.G.

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-06-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20091214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200459 T3

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-01 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-08-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905634 P 20030626

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI