Global patent index - EP 1010813 A1

EP 1010813 A1 2000-06-21 - Draining mat

Title (en)

Draining mat

Title (de)

Drainagematte

Title (fr)

Nappe de drainage

Publication

EP 1010813 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124741 A

Priority

  • DE 29822222 U
  • DE 29900007 U

Abstract (en)

On the underside the drainage mat (1) is provided with individual protruding spots and/or strings. A strip (14), which at least partially provides an overlapping of two adjacent mats, is arranged on the outside (9) of the drainage mat.

Abstract (de)

Eine Drainagematte 1 weist auf der Oberseite 2 eine Beschichtung aus Vlies 7 und auf der Unterseite 3 eine Vielzahl von über sie überstehende Fäden 8 auf, über die die Reibung deutlich erhöht und somit ein Verschieben auch auf feuchtem Untergrund nicht möglich ist. Für die Veröffentlichung ist Fig. 1 vorzusehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010813 A1 20000621

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030417

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000104;LT PAYMENT 20000104;LV PAYMENT 20000104;MK PAYMENT 20000104;RO PAYMENT 20000104;SI PAYMENT 20000104

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000104;LT PAYMENT 20000104;LV PAYMENT 20000104;MK PAYMENT 20000104;RO PAYMENT 20000104;SI PAYMENT 20000104