Global patent index - EP 1010827 A3

EP 1010827 A3 2001-01-17 - Light drainage channel

Title (en)

Light drainage channel

Title (de)

Leichtrinne

Title (fr)

Caniveau préfabriqué léger

Publication

EP 1010827 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124929 A

Priority

DE 19858037 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010827A2] The drain pipe consists of connected U-shaped drain elements (12) connected via shoes (14) with lip seals (26) and fastener elements (30). The seal is formed by elastically deformable sealing parts. The fasteners lock with complementary locking parts (32) on the outside of the drain elements. When the locking parts engage, the seals are slightly deformed and pre-tensioned elastically against the outside of the drain elements. The elements are of metal plate or plastic, and the connection shoes are of plastic or cast metal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/04; E01C 11/22; E03F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/22 (2006.01); E03F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/227 (2013.01); E03F 3/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010827 A2 20000621; EP 1010827 A3 20010117; DE 19858037 A1 20000621

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 03F 5/04 A, 7E 01C 11/22 B, 7E 03F 3/04 B

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI