Global Patent Index - EP 1010828 A2

EP 1010828 A2 2000-06-21 - Production process of a prefabricated wall element for the construction of building walls

Title (en)

Production process of a prefabricated wall element for the construction of building walls

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Wandfertigteils für die Erstellung von Gebäudewänden

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'un élément de mur préfabriqué pour la construction de murs de bâtiments

Publication

EP 1010828 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122190 A

Priority

DE 19858438 A

Abstract (en)

An outer concrete shell is cast onto a plate and a carrier structure (4,5,6) simultaneously embedded in the concrete. An insulating polyurethane foam layer (2) is applied to the inner side (8) of the outer shell (1) and distributed by an air stream. After curing the part is rotated and the projecting ends of the carrier are immersed in further wet concrete to form an inner shell (3).

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Fertigteilwand für die Erstellung von Gebäuden mit einer Innenwand und einer Außenwand aus Beton, die über KTW-Träger miteinander verbunden sind und einen Hohlraum zwischen den beiden Wänden zum nachträglichen Ausgießen mit Beton oder dgl. aufweist. Zwischen der Außenwand und der Innenwand ist eine poröse Isolierschicht vorzugsweise auf der Innenseite der Außenwand, aus Polyurethan-Schaum angeordnet. Die poröse Isolierschicht wird nach dem Betonieren der Außenwand auf eine Metallplatte in einer oder mehreren Lagen streifenförmig ausgegossen, wobei nach dem Aufbringen der noch nicht reagierende und noch flüssige PolyurethanSchaum mittels eines Luftstromes wirbelförmig verteilt wird. Nach dem Aushärten wird das bis dahin fertiggestellte Teil gedreht und zur Herstellung der Innenwand mit dem aus den Polyurethan-Schaum herausragenden freien Ende der Armierung in ein auf eine Metallplatte oder dgl. befindlichen Betonbett eingetaucht und anschließend ausgehärtet. Damit wird eine Fertigteilwand aus Beton bereitgestellt, die kein nachträgliches Aufbringen von Isoliermaterial erforderlich macht und die geforderten Dämmwerte erfüllt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/04 (2006.01); B28B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 23/028 (2013.01); B28B 11/042 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2114827 A1 19721012

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010828 A2 20000621; EP 1010828 A3 20010829; EP 1010828 B1 20040609; AT 268846 T 20040615; PL 190500 B1 20051230; PL 336606 A1 20000619

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141106

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 268846

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20141106

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-06-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150601

2014-05-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909684

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131109

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE KLOCKE SPAETH BARTH

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909684

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI LU NL

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030718

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE LI LU NL

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020123

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GLATTHAAR-FERTIGKELLERBAU GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BAUER, ALEXANDER

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI