Global Patent Index - EP 1010832 A2

EP 1010832 A2 2000-06-21 - Extendable scissor ladder

Title (en)

Extendable scissor ladder

Title (de)

Ausziehbare Scherentreppe

Title (fr)

Escalier extensible en ciseaux

Publication

EP 1010832 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123745 A

Priority

DE 19858885 A

Abstract (en)

The extending staircase has scissor beams (9) each with several scissor elements in series whereby a scissor arm (11') of a scissor beam lying underneath the top step (15') has at least one projection (20) which has at its free end area (19) remote from the scissor arm the support point (18) for support in the roof or wall opening. The support point can be next to an imaginary path between an intersection point (13) and a connecting point (14') of the scissor arm having the projection.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine ausziehbare Scherentreppe mit mindestens einem Abstützpunkt zur Abstützung im Bereich einer Öffnung, insbesondere Dachboden- oder Wandöffnung, mit zwei parallel und in einem Abstand zueinander angeordneten, zwischen sich Trittstufen aufweisenden Scherenholmen, von denen jeder mehrere, in Reihe angeordnete Scherenelemente aufweist, die jeweils zwei gekreuzte Scherenschenkel besitzen, welche in ihrem Kreuzungspunkt relativ zueinander schwenkbar verbunden sind und die an ihren Enden mit den Scherenschenkeln eines vor- und/oder nachgeordneten Scherenelements in Verbindungspunkten schwenkbar verbunden sind, wobei zumindest eine als Trittoberstufe definierte Trittstufe -in ausgezogener Stellung der Scherentreppeoberhalb des Abstützpunkts liegt, die sich dadurch auszeichnet, daß ein unterhalb der Trittoberstufe (15') liegender Scherenschenkel (11';11'';12';12'') mindestens eines der Scherenholme (9) einen Fortsatz (20) aufweist, der an seinem dem Scherenschenkel (11';11'';12';12'') abgewandten freien Endbereich (19) den Abstützpunkt (18) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/06 (2006.01); E06C 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 9/14 (2013.01); E04F 11/066 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29707364 U1 19980820 - COLUMBUS TREPPEN GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010832 A2 20000621; EP 1010832 A3 20000823; DE 19858885 C1 20000907

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060307

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI