Global Patent Index - EP 1010833 A2

EP 1010833 A2 2000-06-21 - Method and device for mounting elevated floor panels

Title (en)

Method and device for mounting elevated floor panels

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Montage von aufgeständerten Fussbodenplatten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le montage de panneaux de plancher surélevé

Publication

EP 1010833 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125211 A

Priority

DE 19858693 A

Abstract (en)

Supports (3) are placed on the supporting plane (4) and each support plate (5) of the supports is coated with an adhesive face so that each floor board (1) is placed with each one corner on an adhesive face until a quarter of the surface of the support plate (5) is covered by a corner of the floor board and a centre access hole (6) is left free in the support plate. The corner of the floor board is lifted by hand to the required incline and the spindle of the support is operated by a suitable tool through the access hole until with the correctly aligned floor board the foot of the support rests smooth on the supporting plane. The steps are repeated for each further corner. A further floor board plate (2) is placed on the support plates and the steps are repeated for all corners of the second floor board.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Verfahren zur Montage von aufgeständerten Fußbodenplatten (1,2) mit Verfahrensschritten, wobei auf der Auflageebene werden Stützen (3) aufgestellt, wobei die Stützplatten jeder Stütze mit mindestens einer Klebefläche beschichtet sind; jede Fußbodenplatte (1,2) wird mit jeweils einer Ecke auf einer Klebefläche auf der Stützplatte der Stütze (3) aufgelegt; die Auflage der Fußbodenplatte (1,2) auf die Stützplatte erfolgt etwa so, daß ein Viertel der Fläche der Stützplatte von der Ecke der Fußbodenplatte (1,2) bedeckt wird und ein etwa mittiges Zugangsloch in der Stützplatte freibleibt; es wird mit der Hand die Ecke der Fußbodenplatte (1,2) mit der daran klebenden Stütze (3) angehoben und die gewünschte Neigung der Fußbodenplatte (1,2) eingestellt; hierbei wird mit einem geeigneten Werkzeug durch das Zugangsloch in der Stützplatte die Spindel der Stütze (3) betätigt; die Betätigung der Spindel erfolgt solange, bis bei ausgerichteter Fußbodenplatte (1,2) der Fuß der Stütze (3) satt auf der Auflageebene aufliegt; Wiederholung der Verfahrensschritte nach Ziffern 1 - 5 für jede weitere Ecke der Fußbodenplatte (1,2); Auflegen einer weiteren Fußbodenplatte (1,2) auf die Stützplatten der bereits ausgerichteten Stützen (3); Wiederholung der Verfahrensschritte nach Ziffern 1 - 5 für alle noch nicht ausgerichteten Ecken der Fußbodenplatte (1,2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/024

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/024 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/024 (2013.01); E04F 15/02476 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010833 A2 20000621; EP 1010833 A3 20001011; DE 19858693 A1 20000621

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI