Global patent index - EP 1010834 A3

EP 1010834 A3 2000-08-23 - Smoke tube for a chimney made of several sections and sealing ring made out of fibrous ceramic material

Title (en)

Smoke tube for a chimney made of several sections and sealing ring made out of fibrous ceramic material

Title (de)

Aus mehreren Rohrabschnitten aufgebautes Rauchrohr eines Kamins und Dichtring aus Keramikfasermaterial hierfür

Title (fr)

Conduit de fumée pour cheminée composée de plusieures sections et anneau d'étanchéité en matériau céramique fibreux

Publication

EP 1010834 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99125012 A

Priority

DE 29822491 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010834A2] The smoke tube consists of a number of pipe sections which are stacked on each other, being provided with a sealing ring (1) which is situated between them. The sealing ring consists of a ceramic fiber and has a conical lateral area and a rim section (42) which has a diameter that is smaller than that of the end rim of the pipe. The edge (4) or the rim section diameter is also smaller than the ring diameter and has a reinforcement. The reinforcement has an elongation which is smaller than that of the edge or rim and smaller than that of the piece which is connected to the sealing ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 17/02; F16L 37/02; F16L 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/02 (2006.01); F23J 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/04 (2013.01); E04F 17/023 (2013.01); F23J 2213/202 (2013.01); F23J 2213/204 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822491 U1 19990304; EP 1010834 A2 20000621; EP 1010834 A3 20000823

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050701

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI