Global Patent Index - EP 1010835 A2

EP 1010835 A2 2000-06-21 - Plastic light well

Title (en)

Plastic light well

Title (de)

Kunststoff-Lichtschacht

Title (fr)

Soupirail en plastique

Publication

EP 1010835 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124752 A

Priority

DE 19857523 A

Abstract (en)

The plastics light shaft which can be covered by a cover has a bearing section (10) on which the cover is fitted, and an edge section (11) which prevents the cover from slipping sideways. An edge protector (20) of resistant material such as metal or steel is placed on the edge section. The edge protector can have a web covering the top of the edge. The edge protection can be a pressed part with U-section profile whose inner arm (22) is connected by the web to the outer arm of the edge protector.

Abstract (de)

Offenbart wird ein Kunststoff-Lichtschacht, der mittels einer Abdeckung abdeckbar ist, wobei der Kunststoff-Lichtschacht einen Lagerabschnitt (10), auf dem die Abdeckung auflegbar ist, und einen Randabschnitt (11) hat, der ein seitliches Verrutschen der auf dem Lagerabschnitt (10) gelagerten Abdeckung verhindert. Auf dem Randabschnitt (11) ist ein Kantenschutz (20) aus einem widerstandsfähigen Material gesetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 17/06; E04F 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/06 (2006.01); E04F 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/06 (2013.01); E04F 19/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010835 A2 20000621; EP 1010835 A3 20000823; DE 19857523 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH FR IT LI

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI