Global patent index - EP 1010836 A2

EP 1010836 A2 2000-06-21 - Device for realising the transition between two juxtaposed floor covering sections of different thickness

Title (en)

Device for realising the transition between two juxtaposed floor covering sections of different thickness

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Ausbildung des Übergangs zwischen zwei aneinandergrenzenden Bodenabschnitten unterschiedlicher Höhe

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour aménager la transition entre deux sections de revêtement de sol juxtaposés de hauteurs différentes

Publication

EP 1010836 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122549 A

Priority

DE 29822236 U

Abstract (en)

On the terminal leg a transition leg is arranged facing the other floor section. The transition leg (7) is linked to the terminal leg (62). The transition leg, formed as a profile strip (7), is held articulated to an angle profile (6) comprising the fixture leg (61) and the terminal leg.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird eine Vorrichtung zur Ausbildung des Überganges zwischen zwei aneinandergrenzenden Bodenabschnitten unterschiedlicher Höhe, bei der an einem unter einem Bodenbelag 1 unterzubringenden Befestigungsschenkel 61 ein die Kanten des Bodenbelages 1 schützender Abschlußschenkel 6 etwa rechtwinklig angeformt ist, an dem ein zum anderen Bodenabschnitt 2 weisender Übergangsschenkel 7 gelenkig angeordnet ist. Dabei ist an der dem Befestigungsschenkel 61 gegenüberliegenden Außenseite des Abschlußschenkels 62 ein Gelenkzapfen 67 in Längsrichtung des Abschlußschenkels verlaufend mit Abstand zur Oberkante des Abschlußschenkels 62 angeordnet, an dem der Übergangsschenkel 7 in der Art einer Profilleiste mit einer endseitig angeformten, teilzylindrischen Gelenkpfanne 71 verschwenkbar gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/061 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822236 U1 19990318; CA 2292119 A1 20000614; EP 1010836 A2 20000621; EP 1010836 A3 20000823; US 6357192 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030531

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI