Global Patent Index - EP 1010836 A3

EP 1010836 A3 2000-08-23 - Device for realising the transition between two juxtaposed floor covering sections of different thickness

Title (en)

Device for realising the transition between two juxtaposed floor covering sections of different thickness

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Ausbildung des Übergangs zwischen zwei aneinandergrenzenden Bodenabschnitten unterschiedlicher Höhe

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour aménager la transition entre deux sections de revêtement de sol juxtaposés de hauteurs différentes

Publication

EP 1010836 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122549 A

Priority

DE 29822236 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2292119A1] A bridge device for providing a transition between two bordering floor segments of different levels includes a securement shank, a terminal shank and a transition shank. The securement shank is positionable under one of the bordering floor segments which are separated by a space. The terminal shank has spaced upper and lower ends and opposite sides extending between the upper and lower ends. The terminal shank is attached at the lower end to the securement shank and is positionable in the space between the floor segments. One side of the terminal shank is disposed adjacent to and faces toward the one floor segment whereas the other side of the terminal shank faces toward the other floor segment. The transition shank at an end is articulated with and pivotally mounted to the terminal shank between the upper and lower ends thereof at the other side there and extend from the other side of the terminal shank toward the other floor segment such that the transition shank is swivelable within an angular range providing a transition between the floor segments of different levels. The terminal shank has an annular recess formed on the other side thereof facing toward the other floor segment and a hinge pin attached to the terminal shank within the annular recess thereon and extending outwardly from the other side of the terminal shank. The transition shank has a hinging seat formed thereon and being complementary in shape to the annular recess and hinge pin of the terminal shank so as to pivotally connect the transition shank to the terminal shank for undergoing swivelable movement relative thereto.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822236 U1 19990318; CA 2292119 A1 20000614; EP 1010836 A2 20000621; EP 1010836 A3 20000823; US 6357192 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030531

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI