Global patent index - EP 1010841 A1

EP 1010841 A1 2000-06-21 - Device forming foot-support for stake or post, in particular for arbour or panel support

Title (en)

Device forming foot-support for stake or post, in particular for arbour or panel support

Title (de)

Stützfussvorrichtung für Stange oder Pfosten, insbesondere für Laube- oder Paneelunterstützung

Title (fr)

Dispositif formant pied pour piquet ou mât, notamment pour pied de tonnelle ou panneau

Publication

EP 1010841 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420248 A

Priority

FR 9816278 A

Abstract (en)

The foot (1) consists of a main surrounding section (3) with a concave recess (4) to receive a post or mast, and a hinged locking member (9) which holds the post or mast in the recess. The locking member is held in the locked position by lugs (9f) on its edges (9e) engaging with slots (5a) in the main section which are set in rows to accommodate posts or masts of different sizes. A variant of the design has a locking member in the form of a slide-in wedge.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif (1) formant pied pour piquet ou mât (2), notamment pour pied de tonnelle ou de panneau, caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend une partie enveloppante (3) définissant un logement concave (4) de réception dudit piquet ou mât (2) et un organe de verrouillage (9), mobile par rapport à ladite partie enveloppante (3) et apte à coopérer avec ladite partie enveloppante pour coincer (E1) ledit piquet ou mât (2) à l'intérieur dudit logement (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/22; E01F 9/012

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/012 (2006.01); E04H 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/2246 (2013.01); E01F 9/692 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010841 A1 20000621; FR 2787485 A1 20000623; FR 2787485 B1 20010126

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050519

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI