Global patent index - EP 1010842 A1

EP 1010842 A1 2000-06-21 - Device forming foot-support for stake or post, in particular for arbour or panel support and method for its closing

Title (en)

Device forming foot-support for stake or post, in particular for arbour or panel support and method for its closing

Title (de)

Stützfussvorrichtung für Stange oder Pfosten, insbesondere für Laube- oder Paneelunterstützung und Schliessverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif formant pied pour piquet ou mât, notamment pour pied de tonnelle ou de panneau et son procédé de fermeture

Publication

EP 1010842 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420249 A

Priority

FR 9816276 A

Abstract (en)

The foot consists of two hollow moulded plastic blocks (3, 4), each having a recess (13, 14) with an access slot (23, 24) for the post or mast, and interlocking faces (3a, 4a) which allow them to be fitted one on top of the other in different positions. After inserting the post or mast through the aligned slots in the two blocks the upper block is rotated relative to the lower one so that the slots are offset at an angle to one another and the post or mast is held in an inner cavity that can be varied in size by rotating the upper block.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif (1) formant pied pour piquet (2) ou mât, notamment pour pied de tonnelle ou de panneau, comprenant deux cales (3, 4) de formes complémentaires formant chacune un logement (13, 14) de réception du piquet (2) ou mât caractérisé en ce que ces cales (3, 4) sont aptes à être superposées dans différentes configurations, par rapport à une normale (X3-X'3, X4-X'4) à une surface (S) sur laquelle est posé le dispositif, les logements (13, 14) formés par ces cales (3, 4) étant plus ou moins en recouvrement en fonction de leur configuration. Le procédé consiste à faire tourner la cale supérieure (4) après introduction du piquet (2) ou mât dans les logements (13, 14) de telle sorte que les ouvertures (23, 24) des logements soient décalées angulairement par rapport à l'axe de rotation (X3-X'3, X4-X'4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/22; E01F 9/012

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/012 (2006.01); E04H 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/2246 (2013.01); E01F 9/692 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010842 A1 20000621; FR 2787483 A1 20000623; FR 2787483 B1 20010126

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030813

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI