Global Patent Index - EP 1010846 A1

EP 1010846 A1 2000-06-21 - Crash detent in a vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Crash detent in a vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Crashsperre an einem Türschloss eines Fahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Elément de blocage en cas de collision dans une serrure pour porte de vehicule automobile

Publication

EP 1010846 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124198 A

Priority

DE 19858414 A

Abstract (en)

The crash lock includes a locking lever support disc (8) which is rotatable about an axis (9) by a transfer element which is movable by a door handle into an unlocking position opening the door lock. A swivel axis (11) is formed at a radial distance from the rotary axis (9) so that with an initial rapid displacement of the door handle (3) or transfer element conditioned by an accident in the unlocking direction the locking element (12) which is loaded into a normal position by a spring (14) can automatically swivel about the swivel axis through the mass forces radially to the axis of the locking lever support and into the locking position.

Abstract (de)

Crashsperre an einem Türschloß eines Fahrzeugs, mit einem Übertragungselement (4), das von einem Türgriff (3) in eine das Türschloß öffnende Entriegelungslage verstellbar ist und einem schwenkbaren Sperrelement (12, 13), das durch Massenkraft in eine Sperrlage verstellbar ist, in der ein Sperrbereich (19, 20) des Sperrelements (12, 13) mit einer ortsfesten Stützfläche (21) zusammenwirkend ein Verstellen des Übertragungselements (4) in die Entriegelungslage verhindert. Ein Sperrhebelträger (8) ist von dem Übertragungselement (4) um eine Achse (9) drehbar und in einem radialen Abstand von der Achse (9) ist eine Schwenkachse (11, 41) ausgebildet, um die bei einer anfänglichen, unfallbedingt schnellen Verstellbewegung des Türgriffes (3) in Richtung einer das Türschloß öffnenden Entriegelungslage das von einer Feder (14, 15) in eine Normallage belastete Sperrelement (12, 13) durch Massenkraft selbsttätig radial zur Achse (9) des Sperrhebelträgers (8) in die Sperrlage schwenken kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/06 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010846 A1 20000621; EP 1010846 B1 20030423; DE 19858414 A1 20000621; ES 2193653 T3 20031101

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051205

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051203

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-12-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051203

2005-12-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051203

2005-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041230

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2193653

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI