Global Patent Index - EP 1010848 A2

EP 1010848 A2 2000-06-21 - Door kit

Title (en)

Door kit

Title (de)

Türbausatz

Title (fr)

Jeu de porte

Publication

EP 1010848 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310036 A

Priority

GB 9827657 A

Abstract (en)

A door kit comprises a door panel having front and rear faces bridged by top and side edges including at least one recess on a side edge, the recess being bounded by a ridge, and a plate forming or adapted to form part of a hinge, the plate being fixable to the side edge in the recess after removal of the ridge or part thereof along one side edge, thereby to assist in hanging the door. This means that the "handedness" of the door is not fixed until shortly before installation. There can be backplate in the recess, partially filling the recess so as to still provide a discernible depth for receiving the plate, and providing additional strength in securing the plate. The backplate can if desired be of variable thickness and include a thinner part corresponding in shape to the plate. This then allows a thicker part to lie alongside the plate. The thicker part and the plate can be keyed so as to provide a firm engagement. The plate is suitably one half of a hinge, releasably connectable to another half, for example via a removable pin. A hinge is also disclosed comprising first and second mutually rotatable plates, and a separate backplate adapted to conform to the second plate. The backplate and the second plate preferably interlock together in a keying arrangement. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/02; E05D 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/02 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/626 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010848 A2 20000621; EP 1010848 A3 20030402; GB 2344852 A 20000621; GB 2344852 B 20030409; GB 9827657 D0 19990210; GB 9929261 D0 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031003

2004-02-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI