Global Patent Index - EP 1010851 A2

EP 1010851 A2 2000-06-21 - Door with braking device

Title (en)

Door with braking device

Title (de)

Tor mit Bremseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Porte avec dispositif de freinage

Publication

EP 1010851 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124572 A

Priority

DE 19857671 A

Abstract (en)

The door, and especially a garage door, has a door panel which moves along a guide rail assembly between the open and closed positions. A brake rail (42) engages the door guide roller (30) at the open position, to brake the door during the opening movement. It has a braking zone which at least matches the dimensions of the door guide roller (30), with friction surfaces (45,47) bearing against the door guide roller (30) during the opening movement.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Tor, insbesondere Garagentor, mit einem längs einer durch eine Führungsschienenanordnung vorgegebenen Bahn zwischen einer Öffnungsstellung und einer Schließstellung bewegbaren Torblatt, einem zusammenwirkend mit der Führungsschienenanordnung zur Führung der Bewegung des Torblattes längs der vorgegebenen Bahn dienenden Führungselement und einer längs im Bereich der Öffnungsstellung an dem Führungselement angreifenden und zum Abbremsen des Torblattes während einer Öffnungsbewegung dienenden Bremseinrichtung wird vorgeschlagen, die Bremseinrichtung zum Abbremsen des Torblattes längs einer mindestens den Abmessungen des Führungselementes in der Torblattbewegungsrichtung entpsrechenden Bremsstrecke auszulegen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/24; E05F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/24 (2006.01); E05F 5/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/24 (2013.01); E05F 5/003 (2013.01); E05D 15/165 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/21 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/26 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/748 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 2702082 A 19550215 - WOLF CECIL R

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857671 A1 20000615; DE 59912496 D1 20051006; DK 1010851 T3 20051114; EP 1010851 A2 20000621; EP 1010851 A3 20040102; EP 1010851 B1 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141210

2015-07-29 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912496

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-11-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912496 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT NL SE

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT NL SE

2004-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI