Global Patent Index - EP 1010852 A1

EP 1010852 A1 2000-06-21 - Sealing gasket and method of making and inserting the same

Title (en)

Sealing gasket and method of making and inserting the same

Title (de)

Dichtungsstreifen sowie sein Herstellungs- und Einsetzverfahren

Title (fr)

Joint d'étanchéité ainsi que son procédé de manufacture et de mise en place

Publication

EP 1010852 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98204252 A

Priority

EP 98204252 A

Abstract (en)

A sealing gasket (1) as well as methods of making and inserting the same in a gap, e.g. between a window pane and a window frame, are described, which includes a support strip (3) made of form-stable material and including lateral mechanical weaknesses (6) distributed along the support strip (3). A substantially continuous elastic sealing material (5) is attached to the side of the support strip (3) and overlaps the mechanical weaknesses (6) at least partially. Optionally, retaining lips (4) may be provided. The gasket has the advantage that the seal is formed in the gap between the window pane and frame and not ouside this gap, even in the corners of the window. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/62 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6276 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6291 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010852 A1 20000621; AU 6439399 A 20000622; NZ 501731 A 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070522

2007-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030702

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI