Global Patent Index - EP 1010854 A1

EP 1010854 A1 2000-06-21 - Drilling machine

Title (en)

Drilling machine

Title (de)

Bohrgerät

Title (fr)

Machine de forage

Publication

EP 1010854 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114714 A

Priority

DE 19738171 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19738171A1] The driving slide (16,22) traveling on the guide column (14) works with a drill-bit (26) or pipe (20). Different diameters of bit or pipe can be accommodated by it. The slide can have a basic portion working on the column, to which a detachable drive unit is secured, typically via positioning portions. Drive units can have the same basic geometry while accommodating bits and pipes of different diameters.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Doppelkopf-Bohrgerät offenbart, welches durch Umstellen oder Umrüsten kleiner Teileinheiten mit Bohrern bzw. Bohrrohren unterschiedlichen Durchmessers zusammenarbeiten kann. Hierzu haben z. B. auf Bohrer bzw. Bohrrohr arbeitende Antriebsschlitten (16) ein Schlittengrundteil (32), auf welchem eine Antriebseinheit (42) lösbar angebracht ist. Die Antriebseinheit (42) kann somit gegen eine im wesentlichen gleiche Geometrieb aufweisende andere Antriebseinheit ausgetauscht werden, die für das Arbeiten mit einem Bohrer bzw. Bohrrohr anderen Durchmessers ausgelegt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/00; E21B 10/44; E21B 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/00 (2006.01); E21B 10/44 (2006.01); E21B 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/44 (2013.01); E21B 7/005 (2013.01); E21B 17/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19512109 A1 19961010 - DELMAG MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19738171 A1 19990304; EP 1010854 A1 20000621; US 6263985 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031028

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021106

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20001110;LV PAYMENT 20001110;SI PAYMENT 20001110

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI