Global Patent Index - EP 1010855 A2

EP 1010855 A2 2000-06-21 - Method for filling a shaft and the use of additives therefor

Title (en)

Method for filling a shaft and the use of additives therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Schachtverfüllung und Verwendung von Zuschlagstoffen hierfür

Title (fr)

Procédé du remplissage d' un puits et l'utilisation d'additifs a cet effet

Publication

EP 1010855 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124909 A

Priority

DE 19858133 A

Abstract (en)

To fill deep shafts (20), especially mine shafts, the filling material is a mixture of cement with aggregates, an additive and water. The aggregate material has a particle size of at least 4 mm, and with the roughest possible outer surface. The cement is pref. a cement used for blast furnaces. The shaft (20) is filled so that the filling material does not harden before it reaches the level (32) of previously laid and set material.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zum Verfüllen von tiefen Schächten (20), insbesondere Bergwerksschächten, mit aushärtendem Material, das ein Bindemittel, vorzugsweise Zement, einen Zuschlagstoff, einen Zusatzstoff und Wasser aufweist. Der Zuschlagstoff hat mindestens eine Korngröße von 4 mm und weist eine möglichst rauhe Oberfläche auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 33/13; E21F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21F 15/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010855 A2 20000621; EP 1010855 A3 20031015; EP 1010855 B1 20060405; DE 19858133 A1 20000621; DE 59913303 D1 20060518; PL 188770 B1 20050429; PL 337252 A1 20000619

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-24 [R26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20070108

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DAHME BAUSTOFF G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090107

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070108

2006-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913303 P 20060518

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAHME BAUSTOFF GMBH

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI