Global patent index - EP 1010857 A1

EP 1010857 A1 2000-06-21 - Modular steam turbine with standard blading

Title (en)

Modular steam turbine with standard blading

Title (de)

Modulare Dampfturbine mit Standardbeschaufelung

Title (fr)

Turbine à vapeur modulaire avec aubage standard

Publication

EP 1010857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811231 A

Priority

EP 98811231 A

Abstract (en)

A standard blading the same for all steam turbines is used as the first blading (16). In addition the matching of the individual steam turbine (10) to the thermodynamic parameters of the respective application is carried out by a corresp. construction or variation of the regulating step (13). The steam turbine (10) respectively additionally has a medium and low pressure part (12 or 22) with a second (17) and a third blading. Also a standard blading is used, the same for all steam turbines (10) is used.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Mehrzahl von Dampfturbinen (10) für den Einsatz in verschiedenen Anwendungen, welche sich durch die jeweiligen thermodynamischen Parameter wie z.B. Kühlwassertemperatur, Umgebungstemparatur, gegebene Kesseldaten, Prozessdampfanforderung etc. unterscheiden, wobei die Dampfturbinen (10) jeweils wenigstens einen Hochdruckteil (11) mit einer ersten Beschaufelung und eine Regelradstufe (13) für den Teillastbetrieb aufweisen, wird eine Vereinfachung und Kostenersparnis dadurch erreicht, dass als erste Beschaufelung eine für alle Dampfturbinen gleiche Standardbeschaufelung verwendet wird, und dass die Anpassung der einzelnen Dampfturbine (10) an die thermodynamischen Parameter der jeweiligen Anwendung durch eine entsprechende Auslegung bzw. Variation der Regelradstufe (13) vorgenommen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/12 (2006.01); F01D 1/16 (2006.01); F01K 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 1/16 (2013.01); F05D 2230/61 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49316 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4932 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49716 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010857 A1 20000621; EP 1010857 B1 20030604; DE 59808650 D1 20030710; JP 2000179301 A 20000627; US 6308407 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051216

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041216

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041216

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031205

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808650

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI