Global Patent Index - EP 1010877 A2

EP 1010877 A2 2000-06-21 - Stroke transmission

Title (en)

Stroke transmission

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Hubübertragung

Title (fr)

Transmission de course

Publication

EP 1010877 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125229 A

Priority

DE 19858758 A

Abstract (en)

The lift transfer device is used between a displaced drive element (3) and a lifting element (1) moved in the same direction and has at least one lever (2) resting on the drive element with lever contact points (5,7) provided by the lifting element and a bearing (4), for transferring the movement of the drive element to the lifting element via a lever effect. The lifting factor is altered as the initial stroke (xp) of the drive element increases by altering at least one lever contact point.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zur Hubübertragung, aufweisend ein jeweils verschiebbares Hubelement (1) und Antriebselement (3), mindestens einen Hebel (2), welcher jeweils auf dem Antriebselement (3) aufliegt und jeweils auf dem Hubelement (1) und auf einem Lager (4) aufsetzbar ist, wobei, bei einer gleichzeitigen Auflage des Hebels (2) auf dem Hubelement (1), dem Antriebselement (3) und dem Lager (4) ein Primärhub (xp) über eine Hebelwirkung der Hebel (2) auf das Hubelement (1) übertragbar ist, und - mit sich änderndem Primärhub (xp) ein Hubfaktor () durch Änderung mindestens eines Kontaktpunktes (5,6,7,71, ..., 7n,71', ... , 7n') veränderbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/32 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/32 (2013.01); F02M 51/061 (2013.01); F02M 2200/21 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20558 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2057 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010877 A2 20000621; EP 1010877 A3 20010627; EP 1010877 B1 20040324; DE 19858758 C1 20000907; US 6367350 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161231

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908945 P 20040429

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI