Global Patent Index - EP 1010888 A2

EP 1010888 A2 2000-06-21 - Exhaust gas conduit for an EGR valve

Title (en)

Exhaust gas conduit for an EGR valve

Title (de)

Abgasführungsrohr für ein abgaszumischventil

Title (fr)

Conduit à gaz d'échappement pour soupape de recircualtion de gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1010888 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112015 A

Priority

DE 19858057 A

Abstract (en)

The exhaust guide tube (2) is an extruded part of light metal or light metal alloy. The front end of the tube is surrounded by an extruded ring bead (7). There is an axial distance between the bead and a fastening flange (5). The other tube end contains an insert (11) of steel or steel alloy, with an end face (10), which forms a valve seat for a valve closure body (15).

Abstract (de)

Ein bekanntes Abgasführungsrohr für ein Abgaszumischventil hat einen Anfang, der mit einer Abgasrückführleitung verbindbar ist, ein in eine Mischkammer ragendes und einen Ventilsitz bildendes Ende und dazwischen einen im wesentlichen radial nach auswärts abstehenden Befestigungsflansch sowie einen von dem Befestigungsflansch ausgehenden rohrartigen und zum Ende hin ausgerichtet endenden Bördelansatz, der dazu bestimmt ist, das Abgasführungsrohr relativ zur Mischkammer zu fixieren. Das vorbekannte Abgasführungsrohr ist einstückig aus Blech hergestellt und deshalb ist dessen Herstellung schwierig und teuer. Je nach den Eigenschaften des verwendeten Bleches ist nicht ausschließbar, daß das Abgasführungsrohr im Gebrauch zu Rißbildung neigt. Zwecks einfacherer Herstellung und verbesserter Gebrauchseigenschaften wird vorgeschlagen, das Abgasführungsrohr (2) als ein Fließpreßteil zu gestalten und zum Fließpressen Leichtmetall oder eine Leichtmetallegierung zu verwenden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/12 (2016.02); F02M 26/11 (2016.02); F02M 26/21 (2016.02); F02M 26/68 (2016.02)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010888 A2 20000621; EP 1010888 A3 20001018; EP 1010888 B1 20040317; DE 19858057 A1 20000621

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59908871

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-03-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-09-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908871

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI