Global Patent Index - EP 1010926 A2

EP 1010926 A2 2000-06-21 - Seal assembly for an intershaft seal in a gas turbine engine

Title (en)

Seal assembly for an intershaft seal in a gas turbine engine

Title (de)

Zwischenwellen-Dichtungsanordnung für ein Gasturbinentriebwerk

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étanchéité inter-arbres pour turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 1010926 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309231 A

Priority

US 21368698 A

Abstract (en)

A seal assembly 134 for use in an intershaft seal includes a first seal 136 that seals to a seal plate on an inner rotor shaft 40, a second seal 138 that seals to a seal plate on an outer rotor shaft 42, and an intermediate seal that is supported by a stator assembly 36 and seals to the first seal 134 and the second seal 136. The intermediate seal may include a seal segment 200 affixed to the stator assembly, a ring seal between the seal segment 200 and the first seal 136, and a ring seal between the seal segment 200 and the second seal 138. An intershaft seal with this seal assembly has less flex than a prior art intershaft seal and thereby results in greater durability and less seal wear. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16J 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/00 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01); F02C 7/28 (2006.01); F16J 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16J 15/3484 (2013.01); F01D 11/003 (2013.01); F02C 7/28 (2013.01); F16J 15/3464 (2013.01); F16J 15/3472 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010926 A2 20000621; EP 1010926 A3 20020703; EP 1010926 B1 20050720; DE 69926203 D1 20050825; DE 69926203 T2 20060112; JP 2000179357 A 20000627; US 6196790 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP. (N.D.GES.D. STAATES , US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP., HARTFORD, CONN., US

- Document: DE 69926203

2017-07-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69926203

- Representative's name: SCHMITT-NILSON SCHRAUD WAIBEL WOHLFROM PATENTA, DE

2017-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69926203

- Representative's name: SCHMITT-NILSON SCHRAUD WAIBEL WOHLFROM PATENTA, DE

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69926203 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI