Global Patent Index - EP 1010937 A1

EP 1010937 A1 2000-06-21 - Microcontroller controlled electric steam generator without separate sensors

Title (en)

Microcontroller controlled electric steam generator without separate sensors

Title (de)

Mikroprozessor gesteuerter elektrischer Dampferzeuger ohne separate Sensoren

Title (fr)

Générateur de vapeur électrique commandé par un micro-processeur sans capteurs séparés

Publication

EP 1010937 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99204312 A

Priority

NL 1010813 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus with which, by means of electric energy, steam can be generated. The invention makes use of the positive temperature coefficient of the heating resistance of the heating element. Through the use of a microcontroller in the electronics, the current through and the voltage across the heating element can continuously be determined and hence be used for determining and controlling the steam humidity and the pressure of the steam. For this, in principle, no other, separate sensors are needed anymore. Due to the small mass of the through-flow heater, the electronic control can respond rapidly to fluctuations. In view of a predictable through-flow, a spiral-shaped labyrinth is provided. During operation, water flows through the labyrinth. In the first part, the temperature rises from starting temperature to boiling temperature. After that, the temperature of the water up to the outlet of the through-flow heater can be at boiling temperature. Said temperature variation determines the resistance of the heating element. The steam humidity can be adjusted through the system by controlling the pump power. When the flow rate is increased, the steam humidity rises, which is measured by the drop of the resistance of the heating element and can be controlled thereby. Depending on the type of steam generator, an electronically settable excess-pressure valve can be provided on the outlet of the through-flow heater. Upon blocking of the steam outlet, the current supply to the heating element is interrupted. The boiling dry of the through-flow heater leads to direct switching off as well. The electronics are self-testing and switch off the through-flow heater if an error occurs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010937 A1 20000621; EP 1010937 B1 20030903; DE 69910960 D1 20031009; NL 1010813 C2 20000619

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-08-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-02-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910960 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI