Global patent index - EP 1010939 A1

EP 1010939 A1 2000-06-21 - Combustion chamber with acoustic damped fuel supply system

Title (en)

Combustion chamber with acoustic damped fuel supply system

Title (de)

Brennkammer mit akustisch gedämpftem Brennstoffversorgungssystem

Title (fr)

Chambre de combustion avec système d'alimentation en carburant amorti acoustiquement

Publication

EP 1010939 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811230 A

Priority

EP 98811230 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus (17) prevent cyclic fluctuations occurring in the combustion chamber (11) leading to fluctuations of the fuel flow (12) in the fuel supply system (15,16). The cyclic fluctuations occurring in the combustion chamber (11) are acoustic vibrations, and these lie in the range of the acoustic natural oscillations of the combustion chamber.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Brenner (14) mit wenigstens einem Brennstoffversorgungssystem (15,16), durch welches dem Brenner (14) ein Brennstoffstrom (12) zugeführt wird, der zugeführte Brennstoff über Brennstoffdüsen eingedüst, und anschliessend in einer Brennkammer (11) verbrannt wird, wird in konstruktionstechnisch einfacher Weise die Ausbildung und Verstärkung von Druckschwankungen in der Brennkammer dadurch verhindert, dass Mittel (17) vorgesehen sind, welche verhindern, dass in der Brennkammer auftretende periodische Druckschwankungen zu Schwankungen des Brennstoffstroms (12) im Brennstoffversorgungssystem (15,16) führen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/36; F23D 14/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/36 (2006.01); F23D 14/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2013.01); F23D 11/36 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00014 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0321809 B1 19910515

Citation (search report)

[XA] WO 9310401 A1 19930527 - SIEMENS AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010939 A1 20000621; EP 1010939 B1 20040211; DE 59810760 D1 20040318; US 6305927 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59810760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59810760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-10-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120918

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59810760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59810760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59810760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59810760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020325

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI