Global Patent Index - EP 1010941 A2

EP 1010941 A2 2000-06-21 - Duct for the escape of flue gas and intake of the combustion air

Title (en)

Duct for the escape of flue gas and intake of the combustion air

Title (de)

Abgas- und Zuluftleitung

Title (fr)

Conduite d'échappement de gaz et d'amenée d'air de combustion

Publication

EP 1010941 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99124800 A

Priority

IT SV980071 A

Abstract (en)

A duct for the escape of flue gas and for the intake of combustion gas, particularly for boilers, or the like, which duct comprises two concentric tubular elements (1,2), means (103,504) being provided for connection therebetween at least at the outer end of the duct. The invention provides that the outer pipe (2) has means (103) for locking the inner pipe (1) at least axially, which means can be operated or disabled from the inner pipe. The invention also provides a duct as described hereinbefore, whose length is telescopically adjustable. Said characteristics may be also applied, individually or in combination, to one-pipe ducts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 17/04; F23J 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/02 (2006.01); F23L 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/04 (2013.01); F23J 13/025 (2013.01); F23J 2211/101 (2013.01); F23J 2213/202 (2013.01); F23J 2213/204 (2013.01); F23J 2213/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010941 A2 20000621; EP 1010941 A3 20000920; IT 1305428 B1 20010504; IT SV980071 A1 20000619; IT SV980071 D0 19981217

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI